WA SB5928 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Making financial services available to marijuana producers, processors, retailers, qualifying patients, health care professionals, and designated providers as authorized under chapters 69.50 and 69.51A RCW.
Title
Making financial services available to marijuana producers, processors, retailers, qualifying patients, health care professionals, and designated providers as authorized under chapters 69.50 and 69.51A RCW.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 83 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Chapter 68, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 83; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-26 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-22 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-22 | House | JUDI - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-22 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 12:30 PM. |
2018-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 6:00 PM. |
2018-02-15 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 38; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2018-02-13 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-10 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | FI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 8:30 AM. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions & Insurance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2098 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.