WA SB5928 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the powers of the public deposit protection commission in regard to banks, savings banks, and savings associations as public depositaries.
Title
Concerning the powers of the public deposit protection commission in regard to banks, savings banks, and savings associations as public depositaries.
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Brown [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2009-03-03 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-20 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-20 | FIHI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-18 | Public hearing, executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, and Housing & Insurance at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-02-09 | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Housing & Insurance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2061 (Crossfiled) 2009-03-06 - Effective date 3/6/2009.