WA SB5866 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning medicaid long-term services and supports eligibility determinations completed by federally recognized Indian tribes.
Title
Concerning medicaid long-term services and supports eligibility determinations completed by federally recognized Indian tribes.
Sponsors
Sen. June Robinson [D] | Sen. Emily Randall [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] |
Sen. John Lovick [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. T'wina Nobles [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | Senate | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Chapter 255, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 4. |
2022-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-26 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-23 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2022-02-11 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2060 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-20 - First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
74 | 09 | 520 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 39a | 009 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 39a | 090 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 39a | 095 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 39a | 515 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |