WA SB5834 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the licensing of bonded spirits warehouses.
Title
Concerning the licensing of bonded spirits warehouses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Effective date 7/23/2017. |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Chapter 229, 2017 Laws. |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-04-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2017-04-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2017-04-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-04-11 | House | Committee amendment |
2017-04-07 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-03-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-03-20 | House | COG - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2017-03-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-07 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | CLS - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce, Labor & Sports. |