WA SB5834 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-15 - Effective date 8/24/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-15 - Effective date 8/24/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Permitting counties to direct an existing portion of local lodging taxes to programs for arts and heritage.
Title
Permitting counties to direct an existing portion of local lodging taxes to programs for arts and heritage.
Sponsors
Sen. Tracey Eide [D] | Sen. Joe Fain [R] | Sen. Andy Hill [R] | Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] |
Sen. Stephen Litzow [R] | Sen. Rosemary McAuliffe [D] | Sen. Edward Murray [D] | Sen. Sharon Nelson [D] |
Sen. Scott White [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-25 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-03-05 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-03-05 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-15 | Effective date 8/24/2011. | |
2011-06-15 | Chapter 38, 2011 Laws 1st Special Session. | |
2011-06-15 | Governor signed. | |
2011-05-25 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2011-05-25 | Speaker signed. | |
2011-05-25 | President signed. | |
2011-05-25 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 62; nays, 34; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2011-05-25 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-05-25 | Placed on second reading. | |
2011-05-25 | Held on first reading. | |
2011-05-24 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 33; nays, 8; absent, 1; excused, 7. | |
2011-05-24 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-05-24 | Floor amendment | |
2011-05-24 | Returned to second reading for amendment. | |
2011-05-24 | Rules suspended. | |
2011-05-12 | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-22 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2011-03-14 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2011-03-08 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2011-03-05 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 35; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2011-03-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-05 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2011-03-02 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-02-28 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2011-02-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-25 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2011-02-25 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-02-25 | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-24 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-23 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-18 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |