WA SB5829 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 1/1/2021**.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 1/1/2021**.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning pension benefits and contributions in the volunteer firefighters' and reserve officers' relief and pension system.
Title
Concerning pension benefits and contributions in the volunteer firefighters' and reserve officers' relief and pension system.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Mark Schoesler [R] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Maureen Walsh [R] |
Sen. Judith Warnick [R] | Sen. Dean Takko [D] | Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | Senate | Effective date 1/1/2021**. |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Chapter 144, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2020-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-06 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-03-04 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-03-02 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-03-02 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2020-03-02 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-24 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-19 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-19 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-19 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-02-19 | House | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2020-02-18 | House | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-08 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-06 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-05 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-04-03 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-12 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:20 PM. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1912 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - Referred to Appropriations.