WA HB1912 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning pension benefits and contributions in the volunteer firefighters' and reserve officers' relief and pension system.
Title
Concerning pension benefits and contributions in the volunteer firefighters' and reserve officers' relief and pension system.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Daniel Griffey [R] | Rep. Joel Kretz [R] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] |
Sen. John Lovick [D] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-05 | House | Floor amendment |
2019-03-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-28 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-06 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5829 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-25 - Effective date 1/1/2021**.