WA SB5810 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-24 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-24 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Promoting the use, acceptance, and removal of barriers to the use and acceptance of electronic signatures.
Title
Promoting the use, acceptance, and removal of barriers to the use and acceptance of electronic signatures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-14 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-24 | Senate | Effective date 7/24/2015. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Chapter 72, 2015 Laws. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-04-16 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-04-14 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-04-14 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-04-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2015-04-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-04-01 | House | SG - Majority; do pass. |
2015-04-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM. |
2015-03-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM. |
2015-03-09 | House | First reading, referred to State Government |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2015-03-05 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-16 | Senate | GOS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Security. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1920 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.