WA SB5793 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning an assessment on cattle.
Title
Concerning an assessment on cattle.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Rules White Sheet. |
2017-04-23 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-04-04 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-04-04 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-04-04 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2017-04-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 11:00 AM. |
2017-04-03 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2017-04-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2017-03-29 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-03-29 | House | AGNR - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2017-03-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2017-03-23 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-09 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | AWTE - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Trade & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Trade & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Trade & Economic Development. |