WA SB5770 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Providing Washington state convention economy grants.
Title
Providing Washington state convention economy grants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | BFST - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Business, Financial Services & Trade. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1879 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-11 - First reading, referred to Appropriations.