WA SB5749 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning rent payments made by residential tenants.
Title
Concerning rent payments made by residential tenants.
Sponsors
Sen. Yasmin Trudeau [D] | Sen. Jesse Salomon [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. T'wina Nobles [D] |
Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Senate | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Chapter 95, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2022-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 91; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2022-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-04 | House | Floor amendment |
2022-03-01 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-22 | House | HHSV - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans at 1:30 PM. |
2022-02-07 | House | First reading, referred to Housing, Human Services & Veterans. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | HLG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing & Local Government. |
2022-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 18 | 063 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 18 | 230 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |