WA SB5672 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting consumers from discrimination based on lawful source of income.
Title
Protecting consumers from discrimination based on lawful source of income.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-02-26 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2010-01-13 | On motion, referred to Rules Green Sheet for second reading. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2009-03-03 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-25 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-02-25 | LCCP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-24 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-23 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 6:00 PM. | |
2009-01-28 | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection. |