WA SB5531 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning special use permits for milk product haulers.
Title
Concerning special use permits for milk product haulers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-07 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | Senate | Effective date 7/23/2023. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Chapter 281, 2023 Laws. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2023-04-04 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-04-04 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-04-04 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2023-04-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2023-03-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2023-03-02 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1786 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.