WA SB5514 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the frequency of county legislative meetings at alternate locations.
Title
Increasing the frequency of county legislative meetings at alternate locations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - House - House Committee on Local Government: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-02-26 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-22 | House | LG - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2022-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-18 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-01 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-01-13 | Senate | HLG - Majority; do pass. |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing & Local Government. |
2021-12-08 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |