WA SB5478 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning restraints on persons engaging in lawful professions, trades, or businesses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning restraints on persons engaging in lawful professions, trades, or businesses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-04-26HouseReferred to Rules 2 Consideration.
2019-03-29HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-03-27HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-03-25HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-03-25HouseLAWS - Majority; do pass.
2019-03-25HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-19HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM.
2019-03-07HouseFirst reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards.
2019-03-05SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-05SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-05SenateFloor amendment
2019-03-05Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-02-19SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-15SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-14SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-14SenateLBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-14SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-29SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-22SenateFirst reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.

Same As/Similar To

HB1450 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-08 - Effective date 1/1/2020.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback