WA HB1450 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Effective date 1/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning restraints on persons engaging in lawful professions, trades, or businesses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning restraints on persons engaging in lawful professions, trades, or businesses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08HouseEffective date 1/1/2020.
2019-05-08HouseChapter 299, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-08HouseGovernor signed.
2019-04-26HouseDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-25SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-23HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-17SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-04-17SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-17SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-04-02SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-04-01SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-01SenateLBRC - Majority; do pass.
2019-04-01SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:00 AM.
2019-03-28SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:30 AM.
2019-03-14SenateFirst reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.
2019-03-12HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 55; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-03-12HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-12HouseFloor amendment
2019-03-12House1st substitute bill substituted
2019-03-04HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-22HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-02-21HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-21HouseLAWS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-21HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-04HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-31HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-29HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM.
2019-01-22HouseFirst reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards.

Same As/Similar To

SB5478 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1450&year=2019
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1450.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1450-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1450-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1450-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1450-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118182&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-12-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1450&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118182&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-17-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1450&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback