NJ S2580 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S4208
Note: Carry Over of previous A5822
Note: Carry Over of previous A5822
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends certain fire safety statutes to update licensure and equipment requirements and liability, fee, and penalty provisions.
Title
Amends certain fire safety statutes to update licensure and equipment requirements and liability, fee, and penalty provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-06 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4208 (Carry Over) 2023-12-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A5822 (Carry Over) 2023-12-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A3894 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee
A5822 (Carry Over) 2023-12-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A3894 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee