WA SB5436 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning transfers of firearms to museums and historical societies.
Title
Concerning transfers of firearms to museums and historical societies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass with amendment(s) by Civil Rights & Judiciary (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass with amendment(s) by Civil Rights & Judiciary (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-09 | Senate | Effective date 7/23/2023. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Chapter 403, 2023 Laws. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2023-04-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-10 | House | Committee amendment |
2023-04-03 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-03-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-03-28 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2023-03-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:30 AM. |
2023-03-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:30 AM. |
2023-03-04 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1629 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.