WA SB5405 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding resident student classification.
Title
Regarding resident student classification.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Hewitt [R] | Sen. Derek Kilmer [D] | Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] | Sen. Edward Murray [D] |
Sen. Eric Oemig [D] | Sen. Paull Shin [D] | Sen. Joseph Zarelli [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-01-30 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-21 | First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1487 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-25 - Effective date 7/1/2009.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5405&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5405.pdf |