WA SB5323 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing assessments for nuisance abatement in cities and towns.
Title
Authorizing assessments for nuisance abatement in cities and towns.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-25 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-03-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2013-02-26 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | GOV - Majority; do pass. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 6:00 PM. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | First reading, referred to Governmental Operations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1367 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.