WA HB1367 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing assessments for nuisance abatement in cities and towns.
Title
Authorizing assessments for nuisance abatement in cities and towns.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Kirby [D] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] | Rep. Larry Crouse [R] | Rep. Tami Green [D] |
Rep. Jake Fey [D] | Rep. David Sawyer [D] | Rep. Linda Kochmar [R] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] |
Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | GOV - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 5:30 PM. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Governmental Operations. |
2014-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 62; nays, 35; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-13 | House | Floor amendment |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-02-07 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-02-05 | House | LG - Majority; do pass. |
2013-02-05 | House | LG - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2013-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2013-01-24 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5323 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.