WA SB5304 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-14 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-14 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Testing individuals who provide language access to state services.
Title
Testing individuals who provide language access to state services.
Sponsors
Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. T'wina Nobles [D] | Sen. Javier Valdez [D] |
Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - House - House Committee on Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning: do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Human Services (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - House - House Committee on Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning: do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Human Services (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-14 | Senate | Effective date 7/23/2023. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 94, 2023 Laws. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-03 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-03-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-03-24 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-03-24 | House | HSEL - Majority; do pass. |
2023-03-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. |
2023-03-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2023-03-10 | House | First reading, referred to Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning. |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-08 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Human Services. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | HS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services at 10:30 AM. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services. |