WA SB5301 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning housing programs administered by the department of commerce.
Title
Concerning housing programs administered by the department of commerce.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - House - House Committee on Capital Budget: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Housing (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - House - House Committee on Capital Budget: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Housing (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | Senate | Effective date 7/23/2023. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Chapter 275, 2023 Laws. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 44; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2023-04-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-04-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-12 | House | Committee amendment |
2023-04-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2023-04-04 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-03-31 | House | CB - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2023-03-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 9:00 AM. |
2023-03-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. |
2023-03-06 | House | First reading, referred to Capital Budget. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2023-03-02 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-20 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Housing. |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | HSG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1709 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-08 - House Rules "X" file.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 85 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 04 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 35d | 080 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
42 | 56 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 185 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 185 | 015 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 185 | 020 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 185 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 185 | 050 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 185 | 060 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 185 | 070 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 185 | 074 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 185 | 076 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 185 | 080 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 185 | 090 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 185 | 100 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 185 | 110 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 185 | 120 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 185 | 130 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 185 | 140 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 185 | 910 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 185a | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 185a | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 185a | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 185a | 030 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 185a | 050 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 185a | 060 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 185a | 070 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 185a | 080 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 185a | 090 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 185a | 100 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 185a | 110 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 185a | 120 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 185a | 900 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 185b | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 185c | 200 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 185c | 210 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 63a | 680 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 79 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 12 | 063 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 24 | 060 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 14 | 400 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 45 | 100 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |