WA SB5149 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Funding foundational public health services.
Title
Funding foundational public health services.
Sponsors
Sen. June Robinson [D] | Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] |
Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. T'wina Nobles [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1201 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Subjects
COVID-19 AND CORONAVIRUS
HEALTH AND SAFETY, PUBLIC
INSURANCE
PUBLIC ASSISTANCE
PUBLIC FUNDS AND ACCOUNTS
HEALTH AND SAFETY, PUBLIC
INSURANCE
PUBLIC ASSISTANCE
PUBLIC FUNDS AND ACCOUNTS
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
48 | 02 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 14 | 060 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 290 | 060 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 25 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |