WA SB5143 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for an increase in the property tax limit for emergency medical care and services.
Title
Providing for an increase in the property tax limit for emergency medical care and services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-02-10 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-01-15 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1318 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5143&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5143.pdf |