WA SB5022 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the management of certain materials to support recycling and waste and litter reduction.
Title
Concerning the management of certain materials to support recycling and waste and litter reduction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 73 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) but without amendment(s) by Environment & Energy (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 73 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) but without amendment(s) by Environment & Energy (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | Senate | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Chapter 313, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 31; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2021-04-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 73; nays, 24; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-07 | House | Committee amendment |
2021-04-07 | House | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2021-04-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-04-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-04-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-04-01 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-04-01 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2021-03-25 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-03-23 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-23 | House | ENVI - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 10:00 AM. |
2021-03-11 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-04 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 31; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2021-03-02 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | ENET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:30 AM. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1118 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Subjects
ECOLOGY, DEPARTMENT
FOOD AND FOOD PRODUCTS
HAZARDOUS WASTE
POLLUTION CONTROL HEARINGS BOARD
PUBLIC FUNDS AND ACCOUNTS
SOLID WASTE
STUDIES
FOOD AND FOOD PRODUCTS
HAZARDOUS WASTE
POLLUTION CONTROL HEARINGS BOARD
PUBLIC FUNDS AND ACCOUNTS
SOLID WASTE
STUDIES
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 21b | 110 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 21b | 300 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
70a | 205 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 205 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 205 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 205 | 070 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 205 | 115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
81 | 77 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
81 | 77 | 160 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
81 | 77 | 185 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
81 | 80 | 470 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |