WA HCR4415 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Approving the 2016 state comprehensive plan for workforce training and education.
Title
Approving the 2016 state comprehensive plan for workforce training and education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-03-08 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2016-03-01 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-24 | House | HE - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2016-02-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-02 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM. |
2016-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Higher Education |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=4415&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/House Concurrent Resolutions/4415.pdf |