WA HB3040 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - Effective date 7/1/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - Effective date 7/1/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding the licensing of appraisal management companies.
Title
Regarding the licensing of appraisal management companies.
Sponsors
Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Rep. Frederick Finn [D] | Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] |
Rep. Michael Sells [D] | Rep. Pat Sullivan [D] | Rep. Alex Wood [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-23 | Effective date 7/1/2011. | |
2010-03-23 | Chapter 179, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-23 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-10 | President signed. | |
2010-03-10 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-06 | Passed final passage; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2010-03-06 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2010-03-03 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-03-03 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | Committee amendment adopted as amended. | |
2010-03-02 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-26 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-26 | LCCP - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-25 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-23 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-18 | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection. | |
2010-02-16 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2010-02-16 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-16 | Floor amendment | |
2010-02-16 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-11 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-09 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-05 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-05 | APPG - Majority; do pass CL 10 bill proposed by Commerce & Labor. | |
2010-02-05 | APPG - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-05 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on General Government Appropriations at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-04 | Public hearing in the House Committee on General Government Appropriations at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to General Government Appropriations. | |
2010-02-02 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-02 | CL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-02 | CL - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-02 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Labor at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-27 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-21 | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |