WA HB2998 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Effective date 3/15/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Effective date 3/15/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a business and occupation tax exemption for accountable communities of health.
Title
Providing a business and occupation tax exemption for accountable communities of health.
Sponsors
Sen. June Robinson [D] | Rep. Eileen Cody [D] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] | Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] |
Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 85 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 85 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Effective date 3/15/2018. |
2018-03-15 | House | Chapter 102, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-15 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-08 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-08 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 93; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Held on calendar. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 2:30 PM. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 85; nays, 12; absent, 1; excused, 0. |
2018-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-03-01 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-28 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-26 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-24 | House | Public hearing and executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-23 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |