WA HB2830 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Updating restrictions on electronic benefit cards.
Title
Updating restrictions on electronic benefit cards.
Sponsors
Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] | Rep. Carolyn Eslick [R] | Rep. Tom Dent [R] | Rep. Tana Senn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-05 | House | HSEL - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-24 | House | First reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6136 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2830&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2830.pdf |