WA SB6136 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Updating restrictions on electronic benefit cards.
Title
Updating restrictions on electronic benefit cards.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Steve O'Ban [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Chapter 64, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-26 | House | HSEL - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-06 | House | First reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | On motion, referred to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2830 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-07 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.