WA HB2793 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Vacating criminal records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vacating criminal records.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-03HouseGovernor vetoed.
2020-03-12HouseDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-12SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-10HousePassed final passage; yeas, 90; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-10HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2020-03-06SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-06SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-06SenateCommittee amendment
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-03-02SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-03-02SenateWM - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-03-02SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-29SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2020-02-28SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2020-02-27SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2020-02-27SenateLAW - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-02-27SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-24SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 9:00 AM.
2020-02-19SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.
2020-02-17HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 79; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-02-17HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-17House2nd substitute bill substituted
2020-02-14HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-02-11HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-02-10HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2020-02-10HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-10HouseAPP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-02-10HousePublic hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-07HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2020-02-06HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2020-02-06HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-06HousePS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-02-06HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-03HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-22HouseFirst reading, referred to Public Safety.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2793&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2793.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2793-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2793-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/2793-S2.PL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121869&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-17-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2793&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121869&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-06-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2793&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121869&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-10-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2793&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback