WA HB2672 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to utility relocation costs.
Title
Relating to utility relocation costs.
Sponsors
Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Rep. Norma Smith [R] | Rep. Mark Harmsworth [R] | Rep. Richard DeBolt [R] |
Rep. Jeff Morris [D] | Rep. Drew Stokesbary [R] | Rep. Christopher Hurst [D] | Rep. Mark Hargrove [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2016-01-20 | House | Referred to Technology & Economic Development. |
2016-01-20 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2016-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2672&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2672.pdf |