WA HB2641 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Promoting the use of expert volunteers in career and technical education courses offered in grades seven and eight.
Title
Promoting the use of expert volunteers in career and technical education courses offered in grades seven and eight.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob McCaslin [R] | Rep. Mark Hargrove [R] | Rep. Matt Shea [R] | Rep. Jacquelin Maycumber [R] |
Rep. David Taylor [R] | Sen. Jeff Holy [R] | Rep. Cary Condotta [R] | Rep. Jesse Young [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2018-02-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-06 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-25 | House | ED - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Education |