WA HB2594 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the health care authority to develop a blueprint for the establishment of a federal basic health program.
Title
Requiring the health care authority to develop a blueprint for the establishment of a federal basic health program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-17 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
2014-02-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 54; nays, 43; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-02-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-17 | House | Floor amendment |
2014-02-17 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-11 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-10 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-10 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-10 | House | APP - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-10 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2014-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-05 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-05 | House | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2014-02-03 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 6:00 PM. |
2014-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |