WA HB2587 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning required disclosures for special prosecuting attorneys.
Title
Concerning required disclosures for special prosecuting attorneys.
Sponsors
Sen. Javier Valdez [D] | Rep. Joan Mcbride [D] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] | Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] |
Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2018-02-06 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-01 | House | JUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |