WA HB2539 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-11 - Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-11 - Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Simplifying the taxation of amusement, recreation, and physical fitness services.
Title
Simplifying the taxation of amusement, recreation, and physical fitness services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-11 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-06 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-06 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-06 | House | FIN - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2014-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-20 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SB6472 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2539&year=2013 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2539.pdf |