WA SB6472 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Simplifying the taxation of amusement, recreation, and physical fitness services.
Title
Simplifying the taxation of amusement, recreation, and physical fitness services.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Hill [R] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Karen Fraser [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-03-07 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2014-03-06 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 37; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2014-03-05 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2539 (Crossfiled) 2014-02-11 - Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.