WA HB2500 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring completion of an apprenticeship program to receive a journeyman or residential specialty electrician certificate of competency.
Title
Requiring completion of an apprenticeship program to receive a journeyman or residential specialty electrician certificate of competency.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Reykdal [D] | Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] | Rep. Michael Sells [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] |
Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] | Rep. Dawn Morrell [D] | Rep. Mary Roberts [D] | Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-07 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
2014-02-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 54; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2014-02-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-07 | House | Floor amendment |
2014-02-07 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-01-30 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-29 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-01-24 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-01-24 | House | LWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-01-24 | House | LWD - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-01-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workforce Development at 8:00 AM. |
2014-01-20 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workforce Development |