WA HB2467 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - Effective date 7/1/2025.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - Effective date 7/1/2025.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing access to the long-term services and supports trust.
Title
Increasing access to the long-term services and supports trust.
Sponsors
Rep. Nicole Macri [D] | Rep. Frank Chopp [D] | Rep. My-Linh Thai [D] | Sen. Jessica Bateman [D] |
Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce: do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce: do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-15 | House | Effective date 7/1/2025. |
2024-03-15 | House | Chapter 120, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-15 | House | Governor signed. |
2024-03-04 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-02-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | LC - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2024-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 58; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-12 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2024-02-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-01-30 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-01-30 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-23 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50b | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
50b | 04 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
50b | 04 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
50b | 04 | 050 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
50b | 04 | 060 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
50b | 04 | 070 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
50b | 04 | 100 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |