WA HB2467 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminating provisions for filings at locations other than the public disclosure commission.
Title
Eliminating provisions for filings at locations other than the public disclosure commission.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Alexander [R] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Rep. Michael Armstrong [R] | Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] |
Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Rep. Jim Moeller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-22 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-19 | SGTA - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-01-19 | SGTA - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-19 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-15 | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-11 | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs. | |
2010-12-18 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6243 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-25 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2467&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2467.pdf |