WA SB6243 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminating provisions for filings at locations other than the public disclosure commission.
Title
Eliminating provisions for filings at locations other than the public disclosure commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-25 | Chapter 205, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-25 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-11 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-10 | President signed. | |
2010-03-09 | Passed final passage; yeas, 93; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. | |
2010-03-09 | House receded from amendments. | |
2010-03-08 | Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments. | |
2010-02-28 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-02-28 | Placed on third reading. | |
2010-02-28 | Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended. | |
2010-02-26 | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-23 | SGTA - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-23 | SGTA - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-23 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-19 | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-08 | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs. | |
2010-02-05 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 1. | |
2010-02-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-01-28 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-01-19 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-19 | GO - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-01-18 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-11 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. | |
2010-01-04 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2467 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.