WA HB2437 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing counties, cities, and towns to request background checks for certain license applicants and licensees.
Title
Authorizing counties, cities, and towns to request background checks for certain license applicants and licensees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-11 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2010-02-12 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. | |
2010-02-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-02-10 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-01-18 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-14 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-01-14 | LGH - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-01-14 | LGH - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-14 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government & Housing at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-13 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government & Housing at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-11 | First reading, referred to Local Government & Housing. | |
2010-12-07 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6288 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-12 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2437&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2437.pdf |