WA SB6288 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-12 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-12 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing counties, cities, and towns to request background checks for certain license applicants and licensees.
Title
Authorizing counties, cities, and towns to request background checks for certain license applicants and licensees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-12 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-12 | Chapter 47, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-12 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-06 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-04 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-02 | President signed. | |
2010-02-28 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-02-28 | Placed on third reading. | |
2010-02-28 | Committee recommendations adopted. | |
2010-02-26 | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-19 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-18 | LGH - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-18 | LGH - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-18 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government & Housing at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-02-11 | First reading, referred to Local Government & Housing. | |
2010-02-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-02-10 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-01-28 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-01-28 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-28 | GO - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-01-26 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-25 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-11 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. | |
2010-01-08 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2437 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.