WA HB2263 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-8)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning governmental continuity during emergency periods.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning governmental continuity during emergency periods.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-19HouseReferred to Rules 2 Consideration.
2018-02-12HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-02-06HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-02-06HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2018-02-06HouseMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-06HouseAPP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Public Safety.
2018-02-06HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-01HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2018-01-23HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2018-01-18HousePS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-01-18HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM.
2018-01-11HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM.
2018-01-08HouseFirst reading, referred to Public Safety
2017-12-06HousePrefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback