WA HB2182 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a data dashboard to track use of regulated substances.
Title
Creating a data dashboard to track use of regulated substances.
Sponsors
Rep. Kristine Reeves [D] | Rep. Greg Cheney [R] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Rep. Julia Reed [D] |
Rep. Lisa Callan [D] | Rep. Bryan Sandlin [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-06 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2024-02-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-06 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2024-02-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-01-29 | House | RSG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Regulated Substances & Gaming. |
2024-01-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |