WA HB2045 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Promoting development of reliable distributed energy resources through extending and modifying an existing tax incentive for certain net metering systems, preserving the existing ground rules for net metering until net metering systems' generating capacity equals 0.5 percent of the utility's 1996 peak demand, requiring distribution resources planning, and authorizing a reliability charge and other alternatives to existing ground rules for net metering, for a utility that has achieved the existing 0.5 percent interconnection requirement for net metering systems.
Title
Promoting development of reliable distributed energy resources through extending and modifying an existing tax incentive for certain net metering systems, preserving the existing ground rules for net metering until net metering systems' generating capacity equals 0.5 percent of the utility's 1996 peak demand, requiring distribution resources planning, and authorizing a reliability charge and other alternatives to existing ground rules for net metering, for a utility that has achieved the existing 0.5 percent interconnection requirement for net metering systems.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Morris [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-02-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-09 | House | First reading, referred to Technology & Economic Development |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2045&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2045.pdf |