WA HB2019 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing educational and training opportunities for careers in retail.
Title
Increasing educational and training opportunities for careers in retail.
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Boehnke [R] | Rep. Jenny Graham [R] | Rep. Jesse Johnson [D] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] |
Rep. Robert Sutherland [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development: do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House Committee on College & Workforce Development: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development: do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House Committee on College & Workforce Development: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-31 | House | Chapter 278, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-31 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-07 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | HEWD - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. |
2022-02-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2022-02-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-02 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-01 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-01-27 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-01-27 | House | CWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to College & Workforce Development. |