WA HB1975 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House State Government and Tribal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House State Government and Tribal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a statewide raffle to benefit veterans and their families.
Title
Authorizing a statewide raffle to benefit veterans and their families.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-02-16 | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5806 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-16 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1975&year=2011 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2011-12/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1975.pdf |