WA HB1965 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing additional support and services for veterans' assistance and for persons with developmental disabilities or mental health needs.
Title
Providing additional support and services for veterans' assistance and for persons with developmental disabilities or mental health needs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-04 - House - House Committee on Finance: do pass (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-04 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-04 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
71 | 20 | 110 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 08 | 080 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
84 | 52 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
84 | 52 | 043 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
84 | 55 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |